Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/31/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/01/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/07/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/27/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/31/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/31/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/27/2012