Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/11/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/11/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/11/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/11/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/11/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/11/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/14/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/16/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/16/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/16/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/17/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/02/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/02/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/02/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/02/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/09/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/29/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/11/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/13/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/06/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/18/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/07/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/18/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/08/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/17/2012