There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Education and Outreach Campaign Repeal Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal section 4004 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (authorizing an education and outreach campaign).


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/05/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/08/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/05/2012Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2012Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/20/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 08/02/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/05/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/08/2012 Referred to
House Appropriations06/05/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5894.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5894. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/05/2012)

Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Education and Outreach Campaign Repeal Act of 2012 - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to repeal the education and outreach campaign regarding preventive benefits.

Rescinds the unobligated balance of any funds made available for carrying out such campaign, as in effect on the day before the enactment of this Act.