Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/12/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/12/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/12/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/25/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/11/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/11/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/11/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/11/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/11/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/15/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/03/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/29/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/04/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/15/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/04/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/17/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/02/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/29/2012