Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 07/18/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/26/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/15/2012