Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 06/19/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/17/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/26/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/18/2012