Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/12/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/13/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/31/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/14/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/05/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/12/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/12/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/02/2012