Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/08/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/18/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/19/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/20/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/26/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/26/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/27/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/28/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 07/09/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/09/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/11/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/13/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/13/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/25/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/26/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/26/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/31/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/31/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/02/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/10/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/13/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/13/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/13/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/18/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/18/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/18/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/18/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/18/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/20/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 09/20/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/21/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/28/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/05/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/12/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/23/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/13/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/15/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/27/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/03/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/11/2012