Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/21/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/28/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/19/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/19/2012