There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

FISA Amendments Act Reauthorization Act of 2012

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FISA Amendments Act Reauthorization Act of 2012

Short Titles as Reported to House

FISA Amendments Act Reauthorization Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

FISA Amendments Act Reauthorization Act of 2012

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

FISA Amendments Act Reauthorization Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the FISA Amendments Act of 2008 for five years.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/30/2012Became Public Law No: 112-238. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2012Signed by President.
12/30/2012Presented to President.
12/28/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 12/21/12, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay. 73 - 23. Record Vote Number: 236.
09/12/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 301 - 118 (Roll no. 569).(text: CR H5890)
08/02/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Intelligence. H. Rept. 112-645, Part II.
08/02/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-645, Part I.
06/15/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (33)

Date Chamber
12/30/2012Became Public Law No: 112-238. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2012Signed by President.
12/30/2012HousePresented to President.
12/28/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/28/2012SenatePassed Senate, under the order of 12/21/12, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay. 73 - 23. Record Vote Number: 236.
12/28/2012SenateS.Amdt.3439 Amendment SA 3439, under the order of 12/21/12, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 52. Record Vote Number: 235.
12/28/2012SenateS.Amdt.3439 Amendment SA 3439 proposed by Senator Wyden. (consideration: CR S8455-8461; text: CR S8455-8456) To require a report on the impact of the FISA Amendments Act of 2008 on the privacy of the people of the United States.
12/28/2012SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S8455-8462)
12/27/2012SenateS.Amdt.3436 Amendment SA 3436, under the order of 12/21/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 12 - 79. Record Vote Number: 234.
12/27/2012SenateS.Amdt.3435 Amendment SA 3435, under the order of 12/21/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 37 - 54. Record Vote Number: 233.
12/27/2012SenateS.Amdt.3437 Amendment SA 3437, under the order of 12/21/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 38 - 52. Record Vote Number: 232.
12/27/2012SenateS.Amdt.3437 Amendment SA 3437 proposed by Senator Leahy. (consideration: CR S8407-8410, S8427; text: CR S8407-8408) In the nature of a substitute.
12/27/2012SenateS.Amdt.3436 Amendment SA 3436 proposed by Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S8407, S8428; text: CR S8407) To ensure adequate protection of the rights under the Fourth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
12/27/2012SenateS.Amdt.3435 Amendment SA 3435 proposed by Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR S8397-8407, S8427-8428; text: CR S8397-8398) To require the Attorney General to disclose each decision, order, or opinion of a Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court that includes significant legal interpretation of section 501 or 702 of the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 unless such disclosure is not in the national security interest of the United States.
12/27/2012SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8384-8410, S8411-8418, S8419-8425, S8427-8428)
09/19/2012SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510.
09/13/2012SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
09/12/2012-5:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2012-5:16pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 301 - 118 (Roll no. 569). (text: CR H5890)
09/12/2012-4:44pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5900-5901)
09/12/2012-4:27pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on adoption of H.R. 5949, and announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Ruppersberger demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on question of adoption until later in the legislative day.
09/12/2012-4:26pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H5900)
09/12/2012-3:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5949.
09/12/2012-3:18pmHouseResolution provides for consideration of both H.R. 5544 and H.R. 5949. Both measures are debatable for one hour each. For H.R. 5544, specified amendments are in order. For H.R. 5949, the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on the Judiciary now printed in the bill, shall be considered as adopted. For each bill, one motion to recommit is in order, with or without instructions.
09/12/2012-3:18pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 773. (consideration: CR H5890-5901)
08/02/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 463.
08/02/2012HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Intelligence. H. Rept. 112-645, Part II.
08/02/2012HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-645, Part I.
06/19/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 11.
06/19/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/15/2012HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/15/2012HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/15/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/15/2012 Referred to
06/19/2012 Markup by
08/02/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-645,Part 1
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)06/15/2012 Referred to
08/02/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-645,Part 2

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.5949. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-238 (12/30/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on August 2, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

FISA Amendments Act Reauthorization Act of 2012 - Amends the FISA Amendments Act of 2008 to extend until December 31, 2017: (1) the date for repeal of title VII of the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 (procedures concerning the electronic surveillance of certain persons outside the United States for foreign intelligence information purposes); and (2) any order, authorization, or directive issued or made under that title.