Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 06/18/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 06/18/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 06/18/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 06/18/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 06/18/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 06/18/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/19/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/19/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 06/20/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/20/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/20/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/20/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/25/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/28/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/28/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/12/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/11/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/21/2012