As of 02/20/2019 text has not been received for H.R.5976 - TIGER Grants for Job Creation Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

TIGER Grants for Job Creation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2012 for the TIGER Discretionary Grant program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/20/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/20/2012Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2012Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/20/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/20/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/21/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/26/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/27/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations06/20/2012 Referred to
House Budget06/20/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5976.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5976. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/20/2012)

TIGER Grants for Job Creation Act - Makes supplemental appropriations of $500 million for each of FY2013 and FY2014 for the Department of Transportation (DOT) for the Transportation Investment Generating Economic Recovery (TIGER) competitive grant program for national infrastructure investment projects for states, local governments, and transit agencies.