Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/12/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/01/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/11/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/11/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/13/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/20/2012