Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/21/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/21/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/21/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/28/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/23/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/14/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 09/21/2012