Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/21/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/21/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/28/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/30/2012