Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/10/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/14/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/14/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/14/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/14/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/16/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/03/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/11/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/11/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/02/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/05/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/05/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/03/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/03/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/16/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/27/2012