Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/17/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/17/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/24/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/23/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/23/2012