Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/26/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/28/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/23/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 08/01/2012