Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/26/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/28/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/28/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/09/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/23/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/23/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/23/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/24/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/31/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 08/02/2012