Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/27/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/27/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/20/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/20/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 09/20/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/20/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/26/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/30/2012