Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/27/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/11/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/11/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/11/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/11/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/13/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/13/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/13/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/13/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/24/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/10/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/12/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/12/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/21/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/12/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/26/2012