Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/09/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/13/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/13/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/13/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/13/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/13/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/13/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/13/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/15/2012