Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/16/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/16/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/16/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/17/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/17/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/28/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/15/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/01/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/15/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/15/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/15/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/15/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/15/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/15/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/15/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/15/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/13/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/13/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/24/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/24/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/26/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/01/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 06/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/07/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/23/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/14/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/17/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/05/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/29/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/23/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/18/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew