Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/08/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/30/2011