There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2012

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2012

Short Titles as Reported to House

Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2012

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend Public Law 106-392 to maintain annual base funding for the Upper Colorado and San Juan fish recovery programs through fiscal year 2019.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
01/14/2013Became Public Law No: 112-270. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2013Signed by President.
01/02/2013Presented to President.
01/01/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 12/31/2012 S8609)
01/01/2013Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 12/31/2012 S8609)
09/19/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6074)
09/14/2012Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-672.
06/29/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
01/14/2013Became Public Law No: 112-270. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2013Signed by President.
01/02/2013HousePresented to President.
01/01/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/01/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 12/31/2012 S8609)
01/01/2013SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 12/31/2012 S8609)
09/20/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/19/2012-2:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/19/2012-2:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6074)
09/19/2012-2:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6060.
09/19/2012-2:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6074-6075)
09/19/2012-2:10pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/14/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 484.
09/14/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-672.
08/01/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
08/01/2012HouseSubcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
07/10/2012HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
06/29/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/29/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/29/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/29/2012 Referred to
08/01/2012 Markup by
09/14/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-672
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power06/29/2012 Referred to
07/10/2012 Hearings by
08/01/2012 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/20/2012 Referred to
01/01/2013 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6060.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.6060. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-270 (01/14/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2012 - Extends through FY2019 the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to use power revenues collected pursuant to the Colorado River Storage Project Act for annual base funding of endangered fish recovery implementation programs for the Upper Colorado and San Juan River Basins.

Sets forth restrictions with respect to the indirect cost recovery rate for any transfer of funds to the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service from another federal agency for the purpose of funding any activity associated with such programs.

Prohibits the use of federal funds to cover expenses incurred by an employee or detailee of the Department of the Interior to travel to any location (other than the field office to which that individual is otherwise assigned) to advocate, lobby, or attend meetings that advocate or lobby for such programs.