Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/29/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/12/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/31/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/31/2012