Text: H.R.6066 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/2012)


112th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 6066

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the parity between the exclusion from income for employer-provided mass transit and parking benefits.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
June 29, 2012

Ms. Hayworth (for herself, Mr. Dold, and Mr. King of New York) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the parity between the exclusion from income for employer-provided mass transit and parking benefits.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Commuter Savings Act of 2012”.

SEC. 2. Extension of parity for exclusion from income for employer-provided mass transit and parking benefits.

(a) In general.—Paragraph (2) of section 132(f) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “January 1, 2012” and inserting “January 1, 2014”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall apply to months after December 31, 2011.

SEC. 3. Reduction in appropriations to Prevention and Public Health Fund.

The amounts appropriated to the Prevention and Public Health Fund established under section 4002 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act shall be reduced by an amount equal to the amount estimated by the Secretary of the Treasury to be the reduction in revenues to the Federal Government by reason of the amendments made by section 1.