Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/29/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/12/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/17/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/23/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/26/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/31/2012