Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/12/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/17/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/01/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/20/2012