Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/10/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/10/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/11/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/11/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/11/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/11/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 07/11/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/12/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/17/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/30/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/10/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/20/2012