Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/12/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/17/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/23/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/23/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/31/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/31/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/11/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/13/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/13/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/20/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 10/19/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/19/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/15/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/28/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/30/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/30/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/30/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/13/2012