Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/12/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/12/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/23/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 08/01/2012