Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/18/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/18/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/01/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/10/2012