There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Revised Organic Act of the Virgin Islands to provide for direct review by the United States Supreme Court of decisions of the Virgin Islands Supreme Court, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Revised Organic Act of the Virgin Islands to provide for direct appeals to the United States Supreme Court of decisions of the Virgin Islands Supreme Court.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/28/2012Became Public Law No: 112-226. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2012Signed by President.
12/19/2012Presented to President.
12/13/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/13/2012Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8046)
11/14/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6353)
07/12/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/28/2012Became Public Law No: 112-226. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2012Signed by President.
12/19/2012HousePresented to President.
12/14/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/13/2012SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8046)
11/15/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
11/14/2012-1:04pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2012-1:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2012-1:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6353)
11/14/2012-12:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6116.
11/14/2012-12:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6353-6355)
11/14/2012-12:49pmHouseMr. Coble moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/19/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/12/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/12/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (33)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/18/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/12/2012 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law07/19/2012 Referred to
Senate Judiciary11/15/2012 Referred to
12/13/2012 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6116.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6116. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-226 (12/28/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on November 14, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Revised Organic Act of the Virgin Islands, with respect to the judicial procedure for appealing from the decisions of courts of the Virgin Islands to courts of the United States, to remove the temporary jurisdiction of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit to review by a writ of certiorari the final decisions of the highest court of the Virgin Islands.

Authorizes final judgments or decrees rendered by the Supreme Court of the Virgin Islands to be reviewed by the U.S. Supreme Court by writ of certiorari where the validity of a treaty or statute of the United States is drawn in question or where the validity of a statute of the Virgin Islands is drawn in question on the ground of its being repugnant to the Constitution, treaties, or laws of the United States, or where any title, right, privilege, or immunity is specially set up or claimed under the Constitution or the treaties or statutes of, or any commission held or authority exercised under, the United States.

Applies such U.S. Supreme Court reviewing authority to cases commenced on or after enactment of this Act.