Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/12/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/19/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/19/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/10/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/11/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/13/2012