Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/14/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/11/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/03/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/23/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/23/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2012