Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/17/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/17/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 07/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/17/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 07/17/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 07/25/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/31/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/02/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/11/2012