Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/18/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/24/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/24/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/25/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/30/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/30/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 08/01/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/01/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 08/01/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/16/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/16/2012