Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/23/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/24/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/13/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/19/2012