Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/25/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/25/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/25/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/26/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/31/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/11/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 09/14/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/15/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/15/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/15/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/16/2012