Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/10/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/16/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/30/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/31/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/01/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/05/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/05/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/05/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/05/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/05/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/05/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/05/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/06/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/06/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/06/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/08/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/13/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/14/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/15/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/03/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 05/03/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/04/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/12/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/12/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/23/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/23/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/31/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/31/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 06/16/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/07/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/14/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/20/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/21/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/04/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/13/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 11/17/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/06/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 02/06/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/09/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/15/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/15/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/11/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/21/2012