Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/25/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/25/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/31/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/31/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/31/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/31/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/13/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/21/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/25/2012