Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/23/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/26/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/26/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 07/31/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/02/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/02/2012