Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/19/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/19/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/26/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/26/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/30/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/31/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/20/2012