Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/19/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/19/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/19/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/19/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/10/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/13/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/13/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/14/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/14/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/19/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/19/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/21/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/21/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/16/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/16/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/16/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/16/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/29/2012