There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Pediatric Research Network Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title IV of the Public Health Service Act to provide for a National Pediatric Research Network, including with respect to pediatric rare diseases or conditions.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/19/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6138)
07/19/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
09/20/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/19/2012-9:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/19/2012-9:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6138)
09/19/2012-8:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6163.
09/19/2012-8:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6138-61340)
09/19/2012-8:50pmHouseMr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/11/2012HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
09/11/2012HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/20/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/19/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/19/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/19/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/20/2012 Referred to
09/11/2012 Hearings by
09/11/2012 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/20/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6163. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/19/2012)

National Pediatric Research Network Act of 2012 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH), in carrying out the Pediatric Research Initiative, to act through the Director of the Eunice Kennedy Shriver National Institute of Child Health and Human Development to provide for the establishment of a National Pediatric Research Network.

Authorizes the Director of the Institute to award funding to public or private nonprofit entities for: (1) planning, establishing, or strengthening pediatric research consortia; and (2) providing basic operating support for such consortia, including to meet unmet needs for pediatric research and train researchers in pediatric research techniques. Authorizes the Director of NIH to make awards for not more than 20 pediatric research consortia, which are to be formed from a collaboration of cooperating institutions, coordinated by a lead institution, and meet requirements prescribed by the Director of NIH. Allows such support to be for a period of five years with additional extensions by the Director of NIH.

Requires the Director of NIH to provide for the coordination of activities among the consortia and to require the periodic preparation and submission of reports on their activities.

Requires the Director of NIH to ensure that an appropriate number of such awards are awarded to consortia that agree to: (1) focus primarily on pediatric rare diseases or conditions; (2) conduct or coordinate multi-site clinical trials of therapies for, or approaches to, the prevention, diagnosis, or treatment of pediatric rare diseases or conditions; and (3) rapidly and efficiently disseminate scientific findings from such trials.

Requires the Director of NIH to establish a data coordinating center to: (1) distribute such findings; (2) provide assistance in the design and conduct of collaborative research projects and the management, analysis, and storage of data associated with such projects; (3) organize and conduct multi-site monitoring activities; and (4) provide assistance to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) in the establishment or expansion of patient registries and other surveillance systems.

Requires the Director of NIH to: (1) require the data coordinating center to provide regular reports to the Director of NIH and the Commissioner of Food and Drugs (FDA) on research conducted by consortia, including information on enrollment in clinical trials and the allocation of resources with respect to such research; and (2) incorporate such information into NIH's biennial reports.