Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 07/23/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/23/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 07/23/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/23/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/26/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/01/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/19/2012