There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PRO-LIFE Act
Protecting Life in Funding Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the General Education Provisions Act to prohibit Federal education funding for elementary schools and secondary schools that provide on-campus access to abortion providers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/24/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/26/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/24/2012Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 09/11/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/18/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/24/2012 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education09/26/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6173.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6173. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/24/2012)

Protecting Life in Funding Education Act or the PRO-LIFE Act - Amends the General Education Provisions Act to prohibit the provision of federal education funding to state or local educational agencies that make health services available to students through school-based health centers, unless those centers certify that they will not provide students with abortions, abortion-related materials, referrals, or suggestions, or directions to abortion services.