Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 09/11/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/18/2012