Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/26/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/01/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 08/01/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/11/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/14/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/14/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/12/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/12/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 10/19/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/19/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/14/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/27/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 12/07/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/20/2012